NE LB80 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for unclassified service under the County Civil Service Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for unclassified service under the County Civil Service Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 07, 2017
2017-03-03LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 03, 2017
2017-03-03LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-03-03LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2017-02-24LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-02-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-01-25LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-01-24LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-01-19LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback