NE LB8 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change and eliminate provisions relating to juvenile detention and probation and provide for graduated response sanctions and incentives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and eliminate provisions relating to juvenile detention and probation and provide for graduated response sanctions and incentives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 29, 2017
2017-03-28LegislatureKrist explanation of vote
2017-03-23LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 23, 2017
2017-03-23LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2017-03-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-03-23LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2017-03-23LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-03-15LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-03-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-03-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER9 adopted
2017-02-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER9 filed
2017-02-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER9
2017-02-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-01-23LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback