NE LB798 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Notice of hearing for March 07, 2023
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Notice of hearing for March 07, 2023
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Economic Development
Title
Appropriate funds to the Department of Economic Development
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 07, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |