NE LB795 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB1003 by AM2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to enterprise zones
Title
Change provisions relating to enterprise zones
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB1003 by AM2651 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40760 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB795.pdf |