NE LB795 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB817 by AM2203
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB817 by AM2203
Summary
Authorize employment of law enforcement officers by natural resources districts as prescribed
Title
Authorize employment of law enforcement officers by natural resources districts as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB795 amended into LB817 by AM2203 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-03 | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Krist name added | |
2010-01-08 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9885 |