NE LB791 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Add and change provisions relating to employment of law enforcement officers and reports of sexual harassment
Title
Add and change provisions relating to employment of law enforcement officers and reports of sexual harassment
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-2-9 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-2-9 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Quick FA147 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Hansen AM2901 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Quick AM2837 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Hansen AM2848 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Hansen AM2840 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Hansen AM2838 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | McDonnell FA146 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Blood AM2809 withdrawn |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Hansen AM2744 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Ebke MO349 prevailed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Ebke MO349 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Hansen AM2903 lost |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Hansen AM2909 lost |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Hansen AM2909 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Hansen AM2847 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Hansen AM2847 pending |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER183 adopted |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER183 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER183 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Hansen AM2903 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Hansen AM2901 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2708 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Ebke MO342 prevailed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Ebke MO342 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Ebke AM2880 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Albrecht AM2729 withdrawn |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Ebke AM2880 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Quick AM2837 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Hansen AM2848 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Hansen AM2847 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Hansen AM2840 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Hansen AM2838 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Quick FA147 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | McDonnell FA146 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Blood AM2809 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Albrecht AM2729 pending |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2708 pending |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Hansen AM2744 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Albrecht AM2729 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2708 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2708 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Business and Labor priority bill |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |