NE LB790 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB890 amended into LB790 by AM2436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB890 amended into LB790 by AM2436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Political Subdivisions Construction Alternatives Act and certain state bidding requirements and contract approval procedures
Title
Change the Political Subdivisions Construction Alternatives Act and certain state bidding requirements and contract approval procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2758 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Blood AM2768 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Slama AM2436 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Blood AM2768 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Legislature - Slama AM2436 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB890 amended into LB790 by AM2436 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Crawford AM2922 filed |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Wayne AM2912 filed |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA108 pending |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA108 filed |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers MO161 withdrawn |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers MO161 Bracket until April 12, 2020 filed |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2797 pending |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2797 filed |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2758 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Blood AM2768 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER178 adopted |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2758 filed |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Blood AM2768 filed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER178 filed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER178 |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Slama AM2436 adopted |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Slama AM2436 pending |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Slama AM2436 filed |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |