NE LB79 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the minimum amount of relief provided under the Property Tax Credit Act
Title
Change the minimum amount of relief provided under the Property Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |