NE LB788 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB788 amended into LB1011 by AM1999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB788 amended into LB1011 by AM1999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change appropriations intent language and matching fund provisions under the Nebraska Rural Projects Act
Title
Change appropriations intent language and matching fund provisions under the Nebraska Rural Projects Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB788 amended into LB1011 by AM1999 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2022-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |