NE LB785 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB862 by AM2441
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB862 by AM2441
Summary
Provide an exception to required approval for certain water transfers
Title
Provide an exception to required approval for certain water transfers
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB862 by AM2441 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-03 | Natural Resources AM2090 filed | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on General File with AM2090 | |
2010-02-05 | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9850 |