NE LB783 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Define "educational interpreter" for purposes of students eligible for special education as prescribed
Title
Define "educational interpreter" for purposes of students eligible for special education as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34423 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB783.pdf |