NE LB782 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change intimidation by telephone call provisions and provide for intimidation by electronic communication
Title
Change intimidation by telephone call provisions and provide for intimidation by electronic communication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34166 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB782.pdf |