NE LB780 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit manufacture, import, transfer, and possession of multiburst trigger activators and firearm silencers
Title
Prohibit manufacture, import, transfer, and possession of multiburst trigger activators and firearm silencers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33953 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB780.pdf |