NE LB78 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Wayne explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Wayne explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to relinquishment or abandonment of any portion of a state highway system
Title
Change provisions relating to relinquishment or abandonment of any portion of a state highway system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM315 adopted |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM315 filed |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM315 |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |