NE LB776 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Hunt name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for nomination and election of candidates on the nonpartisan ballot

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for nomination and election of candidates on the nonpartisan ballot

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04LegislatureHunt name added
2024-03-04LegislatureConrad name added
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 02, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2023-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback