NE LB774 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Enrollment and Review ER200 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to reinsurance, motor vehicle service contract reimbursement insurance, and fees for dental services and prohibit certain activities by health care facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to reinsurance, motor vehicle service contract reimbursement insurance, and fees for dental services and prohibit certain activities by health care facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2558 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER200 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER200
2020-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-09LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM2558 adopted
2020-02-26LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM2558 filed
2020-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2558
2020-02-19LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill
2020-01-14LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 21, 2020
2020-01-10LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2020-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback