NE LB771 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions under the Securities Act of Nebraska relating to registration by coordination and federal covered securities
Title
Change provisions under the Securities Act of Nebraska relating to registration by coordination and federal covered securities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |