NE LB77 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit insurance risk classifications and rate adjustments based on the fact that the insured is deployed in the military
Title
Prohibit insurance risk classifications and rate adjustments based on the fact that the insured is deployed in the military
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |