NE LB77 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to access to sales and use tax information by municipalities
Title
Change provisions relating to access to sales and use tax information by municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30849 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB77.pdf |