NE LB766 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate Federal Funds to the Department of Environment and Energy for reverse osmosis systems
Title
Appropriate Federal Funds to the Department of Environment and Energy for reverse osmosis systems
Sponsors
Sen. Barry DeKay [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2023-03-03 | Legislature | DeKay AM651 filed |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |