NE LB761 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change motor vehicle registration fees and provide funding for the simulation in motion program
Title
Change motor vehicle registration fees and provide funding for the simulation in motion program
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40857 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB761.pdf |