NE LB76 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require notice for Secretary of State regarding completion of felony sentence for purposes of voting rights
Title
Require notice for Secretary of State regarding completion of felony sentence for purposes of voting rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31033 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB76.pdf |