NE LB756 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize persons eighteen years of age or older to buy and sell stocks and bonds
Title
Authorize persons eighteen years of age or older to buy and sell stocks and bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40702 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB756.pdf |