NE LB753 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB753 amended into LB752 by AM1918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB753 amended into LB752 by AM1918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require health care practitioners to provide notification regarding stem cell therapy
Title
Require health care practitioners to provide notification regarding stem cell therapy
Sponsors
Sen. John Arch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB753 amended into LB752 by AM1918 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |