NE LB738 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB738 amended into LB138 by AM1207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions in the Nebraska Rules of the Road relating to electric bicycles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions in the Nebraska Rules of the Road relating to electric bicycles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB738 amended into LB138 by AM1207
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-03-16LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM356 filed
2023-03-16LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM356
2023-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2023-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback