NE LB738 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010
Summary
Change provisions relating to the substitution of trustee under the Nebraska Trust Deeds Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the substitution of trustee under the Nebraska Trust Deeds Act
Sponsors
Sen. Beau McCoy [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Giese explanation of vote | |
2010-02-25 | Presented to Governor on February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-02-25 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-02-01 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-01-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-01-26 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9599 |