NE LB737 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB737 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB737 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for an annual status report relating to the Affordable Housing Trust Fund
Title
Change requirements for an annual status report relating to the Affordable Housing Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB737 amended into LB86 by AM1199 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37681 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB737.pdf |