NE LB731 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to physical therapy, respiratory care, and the Cosmetology, Electrology, Esthetics, Nail Technology, and Body Art Practice Act, provide for mobile salons and remote dispensing pharmacies, and adopt the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Title
Change provisions relating to physical therapy, respiratory care, and the Cosmetology, Electrology, Esthetics, Nail Technology, and Body Art Practice Act, provide for mobile salons and remote dispensing pharmacies, and adopt the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB790 amended into LB731 by AM2432 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB788 amended into LB731 by AM2432 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB681 amended into LB731 by AM2432 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Riepe AM2864 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Riepe AM2864 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Erdman AM2830 withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Erdman AM2830 filed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER166 filed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER166 |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2381 withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2381 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2611 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2611 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2432 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2432 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2432 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |