NE LB729 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Quick Action Closing Fund Act
Title
Adopt the Quick Action Closing Fund Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Legislature - Erdman MO233 failed (Y: 19 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Legislature - Revenue AM2084 lost (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Legislature - Revenue AM2084 lost (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Passed over |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Erdman MO233 failed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Erdman MO233 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA161 withdrawn |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA160 withdrawn |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Revenue AM2084 lost |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA159 withdrawn |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA161 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA160 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA159 filed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Revenue AM2084 filed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2084 |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |