NE LB725 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Notice of hearing for March 02, 2023
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Notice of hearing for March 02, 2023
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to electric companies and electric cooperative corporations
Title
Change provisions relating to electric companies and electric cooperative corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |