NE LB723 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB723 amended into LB873 by AM2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB723 amended into LB873 by AM2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the calculation of tax credits under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the calculation of tax credits under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Briese FA65 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Blood AM1663 lost (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO133 failed (Y: 4 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Briese FA65 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Blood AM1663 lost (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO133 failed (Y: 4 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB723 amended into LB873 by AM2649 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA158 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA157 filed |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Briese FA66 filed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Briese FA65 adopted |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Briese FA65 filed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Blood AM1663 lost |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO133 failed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO133 Bracket until March 17, 2022 filed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1656 withdrawn |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA64 withdrawn |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA64 filed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Blood AM1663 filed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1656 pending |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1656 filed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1652 refiled |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1652 withdrawn |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1651 refiled |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1651 withdrawn |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1650 refiled |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1650 withdrawn |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1652 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1651 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1650 filed |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Murman priority bill |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |