NE LB717 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the amount of compensation under the In the Line of Duty Compensation Act
Title
Change the amount of compensation under the In the Line of Duty Compensation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-6-9 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Clements FA73 lost (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Friesen AM2079 lost (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2061 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Clements FA73 lost (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Friesen AM2079 lost (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McDonnell AM2061 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-6-9 |
2022-03-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST48 |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Clements FA73 lost |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Clements FA73 filed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM2079 lost |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM2079 filed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2061 adopted |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2061 filed |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Pending |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks priority bill |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |