NE LB716 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide procedures relating to electronic delivery of insurance notices and documents and Internet posting of certain insurance policies
Title
Provide procedures relating to electronic delivery of insurance notices and documents and Internet posting of certain insurance policies
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21766 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB716.pdf |