NE LB715 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Governor to apply for emergency rental assistance under the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Title
Require the Governor to apply for emergency rental assistance under the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-03 | Legislature | Day name added |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Aguilar name added |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |