NE LB715 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the prohibition regarding publicly funded insurance coverage for abortion and repeal the Mandate Opt-Out and Insurance Coverage Clarification Act
Title
Eliminate the prohibition regarding publicly funded insurance coverage for abortion and repeal the Mandate Opt-Out and Insurance Coverage Clarification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |