NE LB707 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Uniform Standard Code for Manufactured Homes and Recreational Vehicles by eliminating applicability and references to manufactured homes and renaming the code
Title
Change provisions of the Uniform Standard Code for Manufactured Homes and Recreational Vehicles by eliminating applicability and references to manufactured homes and renaming the code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34051 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB707.pdf |