NE LB702 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to children's health care coverage and Title IV-D child support order modification procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to children's health care coverage and Title IV-D child support order modification procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 04, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 29, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-03-29LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2018-03-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-03-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-15LegislatureChambers AM2244 adopted
2018-03-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER123 adopted
2018-03-13LegislatureChambers AM2244 filed
2018-03-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER123 filed
2018-03-09LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER123
2018-03-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-07LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1887 adopted
2018-02-22LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1887 filed
2018-02-22LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1887
2018-02-21LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2018-02-13LegislatureRiepe name added
2018-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback