NE LB702 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change boundaries of State Board of Education districts
Title
Change boundaries of State Board of Education districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2011 | |
2011-05-25 | Presented to Governor on May 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-25 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-25 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-20 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-05-18 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on General File | |
2011-05-05 | Notice of hearing for May 13, 2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Redistricting Committee | |
2011-05-05 | Date of introduction |