NE LB700 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to public retirement systems
Title
Change provisions relating to public retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1704 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1704 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704 |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 3, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Day explanation of vote |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Correction |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER103 adopted |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER103 filed |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER103 |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1583 withdrawn |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1704 adopted |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1704 filed |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1704 |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1583 filed |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |