NE LB700 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB700 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB700 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the state investment officer and investment and management of the University Trust Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the state investment officer and investment and management of the University Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB700 amended into LB1005 by AM2204 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34044 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB700.pdf |