NE LB699 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for grants to improve technology infrastructure
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for grants to improve technology infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |