NE LB698 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB698 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB698 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to residency for enrollment in a public college or university
Title
Change provisions relating to residency for enrollment in a public college or university
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB698 amended into LB705 by AM1468 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Murman AM636 filed |
2023-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |