NE LB697 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for licensure of rural emergency hospital services
Title
Provide for licensure of rural emergency hospital services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1613 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1613 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA94 withdrawn |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA94 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1613 adopted |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1613 filed |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1613 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |