NE LB697 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change certain district court judicial district boundaries
Title
Change certain district court judicial district boundaries
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO247 failed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO247 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO246 failed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO246 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO245 failed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO245 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO244 failed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO244 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |