NE LB694 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit cities and villages and counties from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit cities and villages and counties from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-13LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-02-14LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2018
2018-02-08LegislatureWayne name added
2018-02-01LegislatureBriese name added
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback