NE LB693 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require an authority under the Community Development Law to pay project-related costs for utility work for a fixed rail or streetcar system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require an authority under the Community Development Law to pay project-related costs for utility work for a fixed rail or streetcar system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2023-02-28LegislatureWayne name added
2023-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2023-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback