NE LB690 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Healthy Pregnancies for Incarcerated Women Act
Title
Adopt the Healthy Pregnancies for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM1919 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1488 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM1919 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1488 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1919 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1919 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER112 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER112 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER112 |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1488 adopted |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1488 filed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1488 |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |