NE LB687 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureQuick name added
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback