NE LB686A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Lathrop FA82 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Lathrop FA82 adopted |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Lathrop FA82 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |