NE LB685 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a funding priority for special-needs military dependents under the Developmental Disabilities Services Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a funding priority for special-needs military dependents under the Developmental Disabilities Services Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 04, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 29, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-03-29LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2018-03-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-03-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER114 adopted
2018-03-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER114 filed
2018-03-06LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER114
2018-02-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-02-20LegislatureBlood priority bill
2018-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureCrawford name added
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-05LegislatureHoward name added
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback